Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Somers Celia Linda, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against 24 Hour Fitness Holdings Llc, 24 Hour Fitness United States Inc. Which Will Do Business In California As Fitness Online, 24 Hour Fitness Usa Inc., 24 Hour Fitness Worldwide Inc., Dome Center Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Nick Jack C., Nick Jack Clifford Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant); As to: CELIA LINDA SOMERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 01, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 01, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 01, 2020PI General Order
Date: April 10, 2020Complaint
Date: April 01, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 10, 2020Answer
Date: July 07, 2020Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: July 08, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: July 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: January 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY DISCHARGE
Date: March 02, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: September 07, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 07, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 12, 2021Complaint Filed by CELIA LINDA SOMERS (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy and How Plaintiff Intends to...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by CELIA LINDA SOMERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by CELIA LINDA SOMERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by CELIA LINDA SOMERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by CELIA LINDA SOMERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by CELIA LINDA SOMERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Bankruptcy Discharge) Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy and How Plaintiff Intends to...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Bankruptcy Discharge)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy and How Plaintiff Intends to...))
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 01/04/2021)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.