Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Braemar-Calendonia Company, Braemar On Raymond Llc., Cantu Deanne, M & A Real Estate Services Inc. Dba Minasian & Associates, Gumarang Allan Dba Creamistry Aka Acme Outright Transaction Llc A California Limited Liability Company, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Citron Thomas Harvey, against Braemar-Calendonia Company, Ting Sung Insurance Agency, Braemar On Raymond Llc., Cantu Deanne, Chow Alice, (total of 11) See All represented by Abergel Shane Michael, Harman Kelley E., Marderosian Lena J., Reeves Dean Allen, Sniderman Jonathan Samuel, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 05, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: ALLAN GUMARANG (Appellant)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: BRAEMAR-CALENDONIA COMPANY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: SAUVE RIEGEL, INC. (Defendant); As to: ALLAN GUMARANG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid Paid for Allan Gumarang; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Opposition Defendant Braemar on Raymond LLC's opposition; Filed by: BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal N.O.A ; B323083; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA B323083; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid Paid for Allan Gumarang; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 Volumes Certified B323083 8-24-2022; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit NA; Affidavit Attached;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Court Ruling; Filed by: ALLAN GUMARANG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: TING SUNG INSURANCE AGENCY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ALLAN GUMARANG, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ALLAN GUMARANG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: SAUVE RIEGEL, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Applioation; Filed by: ALLAN GUMARANG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Errata to First Amended Complaint; Filed by: ALLAN GUMARANG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of Trial and Related Dates) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ALLAN GUMARANG, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid Paid for Allan Gumarang; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: ALLAN GUMARANG (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (-[Res ID: 5069]) Filed by BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to First Amended Complaint) Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of Trial and Related Dates) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Trial and Related Dates)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (-[Res ID: 1946]) Filed by SAUVE RIEGEL, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by TING SUNG INSURANCE AGENCY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice (of Court Ruling (Date: )) Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Applioation) Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) by D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Not Entered ) Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by BRAEMAR-CALENDONIA COMPANY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Advance From October 25, 2...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff, Allan Gu...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Conduct Addition...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED ) Filed by BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by BRAEMAR ON RAYMOND, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA B323083) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid (Paid for Allan Gumarang) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Clarifying Automati...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees ([Res ID: _6022]) Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit (NA; Affidavit Attached;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial Date)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG (Appellant)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid (Paid for Allan Gumarang) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint stipulation to continue trial date) Filed by SAUVE RIEGEL, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (Paid for Allan Gumarang) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other conduct discovery during the automa...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (N.O.A ; B323083) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by ALLAN GUMARANG (Appellant)
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/04/2020)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Answer (To First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (-[Res ID: 5069])
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice (of Court Ruling (Date: 07/09/2020))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (-[Res ID: 1946])
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Trial and Related Dates))
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (-[Res ID: 5069])
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (-[Res ID: 5069])
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of Trial and Related Dates) of 08/14/2020)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/29/2020)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (-[Hrg: 12/04/2020])
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Answer (of Sauve Rigel Inc to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Not Entered 03/10/2021)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) by D...))
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Answer (TO SECOND AMENDED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Advance From October 25, 2...))
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order))
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an order setting a date certain for the deposition of plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff, Allan Gu...))
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Conduct Addition...))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Defendants' Ex Parte Application (Date: 12/02/2021))
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED 10/20/2021)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order) of 12/02/2021)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Applioation)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Order to Conduct Additional Discovery)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF RE: PLAINTIFF?S SLAPP MOTION)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Motion for Order (allowing Defendant's to Conduct Additional Discovery -[Res ID: _9044])
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice (of Court Ruling)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.