Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
5230 Lankershim Llc A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Faramarzi Farah Esq, against Alcorn Brian, Paleo Noho Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Roberts Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Seal Record) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: KEVIN ROBERTS (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Farah Faramarzi, ESQ (Attorney)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: KEVIN ROBERTS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 28, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 28, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: March 03, 2020Complaint
Date: February 28, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 07, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: June 02, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SEAL RECORD)
Date: June 04, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SEAL RECORD
Date: June 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 12, 2020Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: June 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;...)
Date: September 29, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: October 26, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 26, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 26, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 26, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
Date: December 18, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: January 27, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 17, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 17, 2021Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: April 13, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 14, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 30, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 31, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 31, 2021Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: August 31, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 07, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 21, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: April 25, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 28, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Seal Record)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Seal Record) of )
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Summons (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Seal Record))
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Judgment (by Default)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Case Management Conference;...))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Stipulation to continue Defendant's Motion to set aside Default Judgment)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (Default Rejected)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Case Management Conference;...))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Seal Record))
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Seal Record) of 06/04/2020)
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (Default Rejected)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/07/2020)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Summons (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Seal Record)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.