Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gayeva Natalie, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Quality Loan Services Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, The Bank Of New York Mellon As Succesor Trustee F B O Holders Of Structured Asset Mortgage Investments Ii Inc Bear Stearns Alt-A Trust 2006-2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-2, represented by Fink Jonathan Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management141 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time177 days |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Natalie Gayeva (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Natalie Gayeva (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Natalie Gayeva (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer; Filed by: Natalie Gayeva (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Natalie Gayeva (Plaintiff)
Date: August 20, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 25, 2020Complaint
Date: February 25, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 25, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 25, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: February 25, 2020Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: February 28, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 10, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: April 10, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 10, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 24, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 08, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 29, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 30, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER
Date: July 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: July 17, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: August 20, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Hearing on Demu...))
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrers to Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing Date on Defendants' Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Demurrer)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (RE: MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(a)(3))
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Memorandum (Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Demurrers to Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/17/2020)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction ; Case Managem...))
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Reply (Supplemental Reply in support of Opposition to OSC re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Defendants Demurrer to the Complaint; Plaintiffs Application for Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON DEMURRERS, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE TRO/PI)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.