Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Camille Jacobsen A Minor Maeve Jacobsen A Minor Luke Jacobsen A Minor Through Their Guardian Ad Litem Stacie Jacobsen, Jacobsen Stacie, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Fagel Bruce G, Fagel Bruce Gary Esq., against Bhandari M.D. Anil Kumar, Cardiology Associates Medical Group Dba Los Angeles Cardiology Associates A Medical Group, Cedars Sinai Medical Care Foundation Doe 141, Cedars Sinai Medical Group, Keck Medical Center Of Usc Doe 101, (total of 9) See All represented by Brandmeyer Kent Thomas Esq., Hedrick Kristi Kelly Esq., Kelly John Christopher Esq., Vazquez Andrea Dawn, Watson Alexander M, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAudra M. Mori Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2020 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Complaint
Date: February 20, 2020Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL;
Date: January 25, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 26, 2020PI General Order
Date: March 09, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 30, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 16, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 16, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 17, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: April 17, 2020Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: April 17, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: May 13, 2020Answer
Date: May 13, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: July 13, 2020Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: July 20, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 20, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: August 07, 2020Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: August 07, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: August 14, 2020Answer
Date: August 14, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 14, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 03, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: September 09, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 23, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: September 23, 2020Answer
Date: October 07, 2020Answer
Date: October 20, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: December 10, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 17, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: December 17, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 23, 2021Answer
Date: February 23, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: April 21, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: May 12, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 18, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 07, 2022Separate Statement
Date: March 07, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 08, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 08, 2022Separate Statement
Date: March 08, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 09, 2022Separate Statement
Date: March 09, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAY N. SCHAPIRA
Date: May 09, 2022Brief - BRIEF STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS
Date: May 09, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRUCE G. FAGEL
Date: May 09, 2022Separate Statement
Date: May 09, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 09, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: June 06, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 17, 2022Judgment
Date: June 23, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CONSENT FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF [CONDITIONAL] SETTLEMENT;)
Date: December 12, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARINGS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AND NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL
Date: January 27, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER REQUESTING TO FILE MINORS' COMPR...)
Date: February 21, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: February 22, 2023Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: March 01, 2023Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 02, 2023Notice of Continuance
Date: March 03, 2023Notice of Continuance
Date: March 28, 2023Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Maeve)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Camille)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Luke)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (Against Plaintiffs' Complaint (CCP 437c))
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Bruce G. Fagel, Esq. In Opposition to Defendant, Anil Kumar Bhandari, M.D.'s MSJ)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Comp...))
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defts. MSJ)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Bruce G. Fagel in Support of Plaintiff's Oppositon to Defendant's MSJ)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (as to Plaintiffs' Complaint (CCP 437c))
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Fact In Support of Defendant Anil Kumar Bhandari, M.D.'s MSJ)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Brief (Statement of Disputed Facts in Opposition to Defendant Los Angeles Cardiology Associates' MSJ)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (as to Plaintiffs' Complaint (CCP 437c))
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Plaintiffs Statement for Undisputed Facts in Opposition to Defendant Anil Kumar Bhandari's M.D., MSJ
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Reply (Defendant Bhandari, M.D. Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment.)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Frank Cuoco, Jr., M.D. in Support of Dr. Bhandari's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Los Angeles Cardiology Associate's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Comp...))
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Objection (Defendant Bhandari, M.D. Objections to the Declaration of Schapira, M.D.)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Objection (Los Angeles Cardiology Associates Objections to the Declaration of Schapira, M.D.)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Luke)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Maeve)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Camille)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.