Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Shamburger Lakisha, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Tomberlin John, Tomberlin John M., against Global Processing Systems Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Cheng Paul Po Ren, Gardner Rebecca Jean, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with James R. Dunn presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Complaint
Date: February 19, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 19, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 19, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 30, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 29, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020
Date: April 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 08, 2020Case Management Order
Date: July 08, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: July 17, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: July 17, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 17, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: July 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]
Date: August 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/14/2020
Date: August 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/21/2020
Date: August 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/14/2020
Date: September 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: IDC SCHEDULED)
Date: September 25, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 25, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF GENE LIZASO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE
Date: October 15, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: October 15, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 15, 2020Separate Statement
Date: October 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 27, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/27/2020
Date: October 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: November 16, 2020Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.
Date: November 23, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.
Date: November 23, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: December 02, 2020Answer
Date: December 14, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF REBECCA GARDNER
Date: December 18, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: December 18, 2020Separate Statement
Date: December 18, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 22, 2020Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: April 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 23, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: April 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 29, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: May 17, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: June 02, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: January 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: January 28, 2022Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: January 28, 2022Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Global Processing Systems, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Global Processing Systems, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER) Filed by Global Processing Systems, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (by Plaintiff) Filed by Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: IDC Scheduled)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice (OF HEARING) Filed by Global Processing Systems, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to De...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to De...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Trial Continuance) Filed by Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Global Processing Systems, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to De...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Trial Continuance)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/30/2020)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (by Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Declaration (OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (-[Res ID: 9371])
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (-[Res ID: 9371])
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (by Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (-[Res ID: 9371])
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (-[Res ID: 9371])
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/20/2020)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/14/2020)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/21/2020)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/14/2020)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: IDC Scheduled))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice (OF HEARING)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: April 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: May 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 20, 2021Separate Statement; Filed by: Global Processing Systems, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Global Processing Systems, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Lakisha Shamburger (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (-[Res ID: 8629])
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Separate Statement (-[Res ID: 8629])
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/27/2020)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. -[Res ID: _9371])
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. -[Res ID: _9371])
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's reply in support of its motion to compel further responses -[Res ID: _0812])
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF REBECCA GARDNER -[Res ID: _8898])
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to De...))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/18/2021)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's reply in support of its motion to compel further responses -[Res ID: _8629])
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to De...))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (by Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 05/18/2021)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Trial Continuance)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Trial Continuance))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to De...))
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (-[Res ID: 0812])
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Separate Statement (-[Res ID: 0812])
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding Jury Trial (with a 8-10 day estimate) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial (with a 8-10 day estimate) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Yolanda Orozco |
|
April 25, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
April 25, 2022 | Hearing | ||
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Yolanda Orozco |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding Post-Mediation Status Conference (REMSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Post-Mediation Status Conference (REMSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Yolanda Orozco |
|
April 12, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Post-Mediation Status Conference |
|
April 12, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
April 12, 2022 | Hearing | Post-Mediation Status Conference | |
April 12, 2022 | Hearing | Final Status Conference | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Yolanda Orozco |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.