Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Mendenhall Kristin L, against 13729 Rosecrans Llc An Ohio Limited Liability Company, All Person Unknown Claiming Any Title Or Interest I Or To The Property Described Herein, Disabled American Veterans Department Of California Inc. A California Non-Profit Corporation, Kaiser Transport Inc., Sky Climber Access Solutions California Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Murphy John C, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Maureen Duffy-Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2020 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Condemnation (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Motion re: FOR ORDER; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Disclaimer; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: January 30, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 30, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 04, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)
Date: February 27, 2020Notice - NOTICE SUMMARY OF THE BASIS FOR APPRAISAL OPINION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 27, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR ORDER
Date: March 05, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAN MAHGEREFTEH
Date: March 05, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 03, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 16, 2020Answer
Date: April 07, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020
Date: April 16, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: April 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: April 23, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: May 08, 2020Answer
Date: May 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: May 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 05/12/2020
Date: May 12, 2020Application for Withdrawal of Funds on Deposit
Date: June 18, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 29, 2020Answer
Date: July 08, 2020Application for Publication
Date: August 04, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MENDENHALL IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION
Date: August 04, 2020Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN
Date: August 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 17, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 17, 2020Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: August 31, 2020Order - ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: September 01, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: September 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER FOR ORD...)
Date: September 01, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION
Date: September 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 03, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: September 21, 2020Proof of Service by Posting
Date: October 23, 2020Request for Refund / Order
Date: December 07, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 23, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 14, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 01, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: February 05, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 25, 2021Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 02, 2021Order - ORDER STIPULATION RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: November 12, 2021Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)
Date: November 15, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: November 17, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: March 02, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: September 08, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF COURTS ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR OSC RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2022Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: September 09, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: September 30, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: November 04, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: November 07, 2022Disclaimer
Date: February 22, 2023Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER BY DEFENDANT KAISER TRANSPORT INC.
Date: February 22, 2023Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER BY DEFENDANT SKY CLIMBER ACCESS SOLUTIONS – CALIFORNIA LLC
Date: February 22, 2023Order - ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION AND JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT
Date: March 03, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION
Date: March 17, 2023Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION
Date: May 19, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order) Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF LEGAL I...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re notice of SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR OSC RE E...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Kaiser Transport Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other for Ord...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application AS STIPULATED, TO CONTINUE TR...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Motion re: (FOR ORDER) Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice (of Deposit of Probable Compensation)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice (of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens))
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice (Summary of the Basis for Appraisal Opinion in Support)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Motion re: (FOR ORDER)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAN MAHGEREFTEH)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2020)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/12/2020)
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/12/2020)
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Order Re: Related Cases And Vacating Of Hearing Dates In Department 19)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 05/12/2020)
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Application for Withdrawal of Funds on Deposit
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Application for Publication (for All Persons Unknown)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Mendenhall In Support Of Application)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Order for Publication (for All Persons Unknown)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other for Ord...))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order (of Prejudgment Possession)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Order of Prejudgment Possession)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Granting Prejudgment Possession)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Posting
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (-STIPULATION RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Order (STIPULATION RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Motion re: (for Determination of Foundational Issue Regarding Precondemnation Damages)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application AS STIPULATED, TO CONTINUE TR...))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order (eFiling)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Motion for Leave (TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF LEGAL I...))
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice (OF REMOTE APPEARANCE)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.