Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rios Tina, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Al Faiz Leila K., Smith Gregory W., Smith Gregory Wayne, against City Of Los Angeles A Municipal Corporation, represented by Cadena Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRupert A. Byrdsong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management205 days |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: January 29, 2020Notice of Pitchess Compliance; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: July 12, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Defendant); As to: Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Joint; Filed by: Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Gregory W. Smith (Attorney)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Gregory W. Smith (Attorney)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Tina Rios (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 29, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 29, 2020Complaint
Date: January 29, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 31, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: October 02, 2020Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Records (Pitchess Motion)
Date: November 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: November 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DISCOVERY OF PEACE OFFICER PERSONNEL RE...)
Date: December 03, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 03, 2020Order - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S PITCHESS MOTION
Date: December 03, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DF'S EX PARTE APP RE IN CAMERA HEARING
Date: December 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE IN CAMERA HEARING...)
Date: December 22, 2020Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING IN PART DF'S EX PARTE APP TO CONT IN CAMERA HEARING
Date: December 29, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (IN-CAMERA HEARING; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: February 08, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF PITCHESS COMPLIANCE
Date: February 18, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES
Date: January 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: March 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: September 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRETRIA...)
Date: September 15, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 07, 2023Association of Attorney
Date: October 28, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: February 14, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: February 15, 2023Complaint Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Gregory Wayne Smith (Attorney)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRETRIA...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (In-Camera Hearing; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Order (on Plaintiff's Pitchess Motion) Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue In Camera Hearing...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Gregory Wayne Smith (Attorney)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Records (Pitchess Motion) Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice (of Pitchess Compliance) Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Pretria...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 04, 2020Answer
Date: March 13, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 06, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/29/2020
Date: April 29, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 29, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: August 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts (Joint) Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Tina Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/29/2020)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Records (Pitchess Motion)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (In-Camera Hearing; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Order (Granting in Part Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue In Camera Hearing)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Pretria...))
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Protective Order-Confidential Designation Only
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue In Camera Hearing...))
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Order (on Plaintiff's Pitchess Motion)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice (of Pitchess Compliance)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Trial and Pretrial Dates)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts (Joint)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.