Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Americold Logistics Llc, Americold Logistics Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Art Mortgage Borrower Opco 2010-5 Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Art Mortgage Borrower Propco 2010-5 Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, United Natural Foods Inc., (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Ciarlo David A, Ciarlo David Anthony, Grabowski Richard, Grabowski Richard Joseph, against Americold Logistics Llc, Americold Realty Trust, Art Mortgage Borrower Opco 2010-5 Llc, Art Mortgage Borrower Propco 2010-5 Llc, United Natural Foods Inc. A Delaware Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Akrotirianakis Joseph N., Akrotirianakis Joseph Nicholas, Craig Aaron Bennett, Grabowski Richard Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Olivia Rosales presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management243 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Order - Trial Setting; Filed by: Clerk; As to: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order advancing and continuing hearing set for ;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing held 8-12-21); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Americold Logistics, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Americold Logistics, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Declaration OF DAVID A. CIARLO; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Order / Ruling (Hearing 7-9-20); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service Summons; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff); Service Cost Waived: No
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: January 24, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2020Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS
Date: February 06, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)
Date: February 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)
Date: February 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...)
Date: February 14, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 10, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: April 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2020
Date: April 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER
Date: May 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 12, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 26, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID A. CIARLO
Date: May 26, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: July 01, 2020Order - ORDER / RULING (HEARING 7-9-20)
Date: July 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 10, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: September 04, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 08, 2020Order - ORDER / RULING (HEARING HELD 9-8-20)
Date: September 08, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 09, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: September 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: September 24, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: September 25, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 04, 2020Answer
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: November 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: November 18, 2020Order - ORDER - TRIAL SETTING
Date: November 18, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 12, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: April 26, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER
Date: April 26, 2021Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: May 14, 2021Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: May 14, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF CIARLO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: May 14, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES
Date: June 01, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 08, 2021Order - COURT ORDER/RULING (HEARING 7-8-21)
Date: July 08, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 08, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: July 19, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: July 28, 2021Order - COURT ORDER/RULING (HEARING HELD 8-10-21)
Date: August 10, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: August 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: August 11, 2021Order - COURT ORDER/RULING (HEARING HELD 8-12-21)
Date: August 12, 2021Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: August 26, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: September 14, 2021Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: October 05, 2021Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: October 06, 2021Order - COURT ORDER/RULING (HEARING 10-14-21)
Date: October 14, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF ELISA GOMEZ
Date: October 26, 2021Memorandum - MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: October 26, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN LAURO
Date: October 26, 2021Response - RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: November 04, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: November 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: November 09, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID A. CIARLO
Date: November 15, 2021Order - COURT ORDER/RULING (HEARING 11-9-21)
Date: November 09, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 15, 2021Separate Statement
Date: November 15, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: November 15, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF AARON CRAIG IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: November 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: November 15, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO FURTHER RESPOND AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS
Date: November 24, 2021Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT
Date: November 24, 2021Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: February 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: February 10, 2022Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: February 15, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 23, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 25, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Date: February 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - MSC DATE CHANGE:)
Date: March 04, 2022Certificate - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2022Certificate - CERTIFICATE /PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 23, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARINGS
Date: March 23, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 24, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID A. CIARLO
Date: March 25, 2022Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: March 25, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 25, 2022Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: March 28, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 29, 2022Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: April 04, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION
Date: April 06, 2022Order - COURT RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER (HEARING HELD 4-7-22)
Date: April 07, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: April 08, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 08, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 12, 2022Order - ORDER - PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: April 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: April 13, 2022Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: April 13, 2022Order - COURT RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER (HEARING 5-10-22)
Date: May 10, 2022Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Ruling on Notice of Related Case;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 7-8-21); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Response in Support of the Notice of Related Cases; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Order / Ruling (Hearing held 9-8-20); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing held 8-10-21); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Order - Trial Setting; Filed by: Clerk; As to: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate /Proof of Service; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Declaration of David A. Ciarlo; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Declaration of Steven Senn; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Court Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing 5-10-22); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 11-9-21); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Declaration of John Lauro; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 4-13-22); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Court Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing Held 4-7-22); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Declaration of David A. Ciarlo; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order advancing and continuing hearing set for ;))
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Response (in Support of the Notice of Related Cases)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID A. CIARLO)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service Summons
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...) of )
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order advancing and continuing hearing set for ;) of )
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice ( OF RELATED CASE)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Ruling on Notice of Related Case;) of )
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of )
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Order (/ Ruling (Hearing 7-9-20))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Ruling on Notice of Related Case;))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...))
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation And Order To Continue Hearing)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration (And to Stay Litigation)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of )
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Poonam Patel ISO Defendants' Opposition to Unfi's Motion to Compel to Produce Documents)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 10-14-21)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY LITIGATION)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Special Interrogatories, Set Four)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Opposition (of Defendants' to Plaintiffs' Motion to Produce Documents)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Hearing 11-9-21))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Order (/ Ruling (Hearing held 9-8-20))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order Continuing Case Management Conference and Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Granting Motion To Continue Trial Date)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY LITIGATION)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing held 8-10-21)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFF UNITED NATURAL FOODS, INC.S REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Memorandum (in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Order (- Trial Setting)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Declaration (of David A. Ciarlo in Support of Motion to Continue Trial Date And Related Deadlines)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Notice of John Lauro and For Protective Order)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF MONICA RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Their Motion For Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice (Compendium of Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Motion For Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Brief (INDEX OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF KELLY PERIGOE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Opposition to Motion For Summary Adjudication And Additional Material Facts)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Notice of Anthony Santorelli and For Protective Order)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Sp...))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice (Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel the Deposition of John Lauro)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Defendants' Notice of Motion For Judgment on The Pleadings)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Their Motion For Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for an Order)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 12-9-21)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 7-8-21)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Motion to Continue Trial Date And Related Deadlines)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses To Sp...))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Steven Senn)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Declaration (of David A. Ciarlo)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 11-9-21)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Aaron Craig in support of Opposition to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Non-...))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Objection (Defendants' Objection To The Declarations of Steven Senn, Elsa Gomez, And John Lauro)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants To Further Respond And Produce Documents)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Defendants TO Further Respond And Produce Documents)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF FINAL ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Certificate (/Proof of Service)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review - MSC DATE CHANGE:))
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARINGS)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) Resumes from February 1...))
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Response (Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Separate Statement)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Hearing 12-9-21))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Elisa Gomez)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...))
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing Hearin...))
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Declaration (of David A. Ciarlo)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Hearing 4-7-22, 1:30 PM))
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter - Hearing Held April 07, 2022) of )
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Order (- Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 4-13-22)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFF UNITED NATURAL FOOD...))
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter - Hearing Held April 07, 2022))
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFF UNITED NATURAL FOOD...))
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF AARON S. CRAIG IN SUPPORT OF AMERICOLD?S OPPOSITION TO UNFI?S MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE OF MIKE STIGERS AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Court Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing Held 4-7-22)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Hearing 4-13-22))
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (FOR LEAVE TO CONTINUE THE DEPOSITION OF THIRD PARTY KARRIE MIKKILA)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Declaration of Elisa Gomez; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 10-14-21); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 12-9-21); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER - HEARING HELD MAY 10, 2022) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: United Natural Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories Set Four)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Declaration (Of Ciarlo In Support Of Motion To Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (To Produce Documents and Provide Further Responses)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing held 8-12-21)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Declaration (of John Lauro)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses To Pr...))
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID A. CIARLO)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Order (/ Ruling (Hearing 7-9-20))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Ruling on Notice of Related Case;) of 08/04/2020)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Ruling on Notice of Related Case;))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY LITIGATION)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY LITIGATION)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Order (/ Ruling (Hearing held 9-8-20))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order Continuing Case Management Conference and Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Order (- Trial Setting)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (To Produce Documents and Provide Further Responses)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for an Order)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Notice of John Lauro and For Protective Order)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Granting Motion To Continue Trial Date)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Notice of Anthony Santorelli and For Protective Order)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Declaration (Of Ciarlo In Support Of Motion To Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Motion to Continue Trial Date And Related Deadlines)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Declaration (of David A. Ciarlo in Support of Motion to Continue Trial Date And Related Deadlines)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses To Sp...))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 7-8-21)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice (Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel the Deposition of John Lauro)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Defendants' Notice of Motion For Judgment on The Pleadings)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Opposition (of Defendants' to Plaintiffs' Motion to Produce Documents)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Poonam Patel ISO Defendants' Opposition to Unfi's Motion to Compel to Produce Documents)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing held 8-10-21)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFF UNITED NATURAL FOODS, INC.S REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing held 8-12-21)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses To Pr...))
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF FINAL ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Their Motion For Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF KELLY PERIGOE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF MONICA RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Their Motion For Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Brief (INDEX OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Special Interrogatories, Set Four)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories Set Four)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Sp...))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 10-14-21)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Memorandum (in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Steven Senn)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice (Compendium of Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Motion For Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Objection (Defendants' Objection To The Declarations of Steven Senn, Elsa Gomez, And John Lauro)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Elisa Gomez)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (of John Lauro)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Opposition to Motion For Summary Adjudication And Additional Material Facts)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 11-9-21)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Hearing 11-9-21))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (of David A. Ciarlo)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Response (Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Separate Statement)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Defendants TO Further Respond And Produce Documents)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Aaron Craig in support of Opposition to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Hearing 12-9-21))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Non-...))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 12-9-21)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants To Further Respond And Produce Documents)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review - MSC DATE CHANGE:))
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Certificate (/Proof of Service)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Opposition (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARINGS)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of 02/07/2020)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...))
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration (And to Stay Litigation)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation And Order To Continue Hearing)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice ( OF RELATED CASE)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/21/2020)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Response (in Support of the Notice of Related Cases)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order advancing and continuing hearing set for 6/16/2020;))
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/12/2020)
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.