Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kiramittchian Hovannes, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Ter-Oganesyan Liana, against Cit Bank N.A., Cit Group Inc., City Of Los Angeles A Public Entity, County Of Los Angeles A Public Entity, One West Bank, (total of 5) See All represented by Eli Rona, Guterres Tomas Antonio, Shikibu Margaret, Loomis Richard Henry, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2020 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: Hovannes Kiramittchian (Plaintiff)
Date: July 18, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 18, 2023Complaint
Date: January 23, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 23, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 23, 2020PI General Order
Date: January 28, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 08, 2021Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: October 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)
Date: September 27, 2021Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: November 10, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: November 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL F...)
Date: November 30, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 14, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: March 14, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 14, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 13, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 13, 2022Answer
Date: May 04, 2022Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: May 09, 2022Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: December 20, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: January 10, 2023Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: April 05, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 09, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: April 07, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 17, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/17/2023
Date: April 17, 2023Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Hovannes Kiramittchian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by City of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Hovannes Kiramittchian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Hovannes Kiramittchian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Hovannes Kiramittchian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by One West Bank (Defendant); CIT Group, Inc. (Defendant); CIT Bank, N.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Hovannes Kiramittchian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by City of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal f...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Hovannes Kiramittchian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Hovannes Kiramittchian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT;)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...))
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...) of )
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal f...))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...))
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...))
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...))
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...))
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...))
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal f...))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...))
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT;)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.