Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Audrey Ortega A Minor By And Through Her Guardian Ad Litem Rochelle Delgadillo, Delgadillo Myrna, Delgadillo Rochelle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Azizi Daniel, against Ventura Frank, Ventura Leanna, represented by Desalernos Stefanie Christine, Wells Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Crowley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 22, 2020Complaint
Date: January 22, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 22, 2020PI General Order
Date: January 28, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 13, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 13, 2020Answer
Date: June 02, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: June 02, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 31, 2020Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 26, 2020Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: August 26, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR
Date: September 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY
Date: February 16, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL
Date: May 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: August 05, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/05/2022
Date: August 05, 2022Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Handling Attorney) Filed by LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by LEANNA VENTURA (Defendant); FRANK VENTURA (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by MYRNA DELGADILLO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Audrey)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Handling Attorney)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Compel Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Demand for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing Trial)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Audrey)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Demand for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.