Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Roman Luis An Individual, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Horacek Angel, against Advent Resources Inc. A Corporation, represented by Folan Patrick J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management171 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: January 21, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Advent Resources, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Advent Resources, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Advent Resources, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Declaration Compendium of Evidence; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Advent Resources, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Advent Resources, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Advent Resources, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration IN SUPPORT; Filed by: Advent Resources, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information AMENDED; Filed by: Patrick J. Folan (Attorney)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: October 10, 2023Notice of Continued Post Mediation Status Conference; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Declaration of Angel J Horacek; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Advent Resources, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Advent Resources, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Order Ruling re: defendant Advent Resources, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Separate Statement (IN ADVANCE OF THE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice (OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANGEL J. HORACEK IN ADVANCE OF THE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Inte...))
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/04/2020)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel (TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoen...))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 05/10/2021)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production, Set Two)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, SET ONE)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Angel J Horacek)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (Compendium of Evidence)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Plaintiff Luis Roman)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Ruling Re: Plaintiff Luis Roman's Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Objection (to Defendants' Evidence in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Response (to Defendants' Evidence in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/29/2021)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stiplation and Order to Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice (of Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Linda Lee, CSR #13568)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Objection (TO EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Order (Ruling re: defendant Advent Resources, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication))
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoena)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Advent Resources, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Declaration of Plaintiff Luis Roman; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Luis Roman, an individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Ruling Re: Plaintiff Luis Roman's Motion for Summary Adjudication; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.