Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Xxxxxx Xxxxx An Individual, Xxxxxx Xxxxxx A Minor By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem Xxxxx Xxxxxx, Xxxxxx Xxxx By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem Xxxxx Xxxxxx, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Panish Brian J., Panish Brian Joseph Esq., against City Of Los Angeles A Government Entity, represented by Woodward Karen, Woodward Karen Elizabeth Deputy City Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 14, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 14, 2020Complaint
Date: January 14, 2020PI General Order
Date: January 22, 2020Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: January 28, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Petitione...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, xxxxx xxxxxx's Pet...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles, a government entity (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Pending Appro...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Proof of Deposit of Money I...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Proof of Deposit of Money I...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit of Money into Blocke...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Pending Appro...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Hearings)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, xxxxx xxxxxx's Pet...))
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of hearing continuance)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Pending Appro...))
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Petitione...))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Reply (TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account ((as to Minor Claimant: xxxx xxxxxx - Age 12))
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference))
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Pending Appro...))
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice (OF PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY AS TO MINOR CLAIMANT xxxxxx xxxxxx)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference))
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Reply (TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of hearing continuance)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account ((as to Minor Claimant: xxxx xxxxxx - Age 12))
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Petitione...))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, xxxxx xxxxxx's Pet...))
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Pending Appro...))
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 07, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: April 09, 2020Motion for Trial Preference
Date: November 24, 2020Answer
Date: May 11, 2020Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING
Date: December 21, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 14, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: April 28, 2021Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: June 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS
Date: January 31, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY AS TO MINOR CLAIMANT xxxxxx xxxxxx
Date: April 22, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT
Date: September 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: October 28, 2022Order - Dismissal
Date: October 28, 2022Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.