Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chang Jiyoung Aka Jessica Jiyoung Jahng, Chang Jiyoung, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 30, 2020Petition for Change of Name
Date: November 30, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 30, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: December 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: March 08, 2021Decree Changing Name
Date: March 08, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Decree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: Jiyoung Chang (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Publication; Filed by: Jiyoung Chang (Petitioner); As to: Jiyoung Chang (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: Jiyoung Chang (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Jiyoung Chang (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jiyoung Chang (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Jiyoung Chang (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Jiyoung Chang (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Jiyoung Chang (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jiyoung Chang (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Jiyoung Chang (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.