Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Velasco Lilia, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case against City Of Los Angeles State Of California A Municipal Corporation, Michel Moore Chief Of Police City Of Los Angeles, represented by Park Hoon Suk, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Brief (opening)
Date: December 14, 2021Opposition (to Petition for Writ of Mandate; Memo of Ps&As)
Date: January 13, 2022Petition (writ of Administative Mandamus)
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: April 08, 2021Petitioners Reply Brief to Respondents' Opposition
Date: January 25, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Petition writ of Administative Mandamus; Filed by: Lilia Velasco (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Brief opening; Filed by: Lilia Velasco (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Petitioners Reply Brief to Respondents' Opposition; Filed by: Lilia Velasco (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lilia Velasco (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Petition - PETITION WRIT OF ADMINISTATIVE MANDAMUS
Date: November 12, 2020Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: November 12, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 02, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 12, 2020Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO CITY OF L.A.
Date: January 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: February 25, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF NEW TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: February 26, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDERS FROM TSC
Date: April 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: April 08, 2021Brief - BRIEF OPENING
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; MEMO OF PS&AS
Date: January 13, 2022Reply - PETITIONERS REPLY BRIEF TO RESPONDENTS' OPPOSITION
Date: January 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 10, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/10/2022
Date: February 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: February 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW
Date: February 18, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: February 18, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NTC OF LODGING JOINT APPENDIX
Date: May 26, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AFTER TRIAL;
Date: June 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: June 07, 2022Writ of Mandate
Date: June 14, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF HOON PARK
Date: June 14, 2022Judgment
Date: June 14, 2022Writ - Return - NOTICE RESPONDENTS' RETURN TO WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: July 14, 2022Writ of Mandate
Date: July 14, 2022Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER))
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (PERSONAL SERVICE OF OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order (non-appearance case review)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice (of Court Orders from TSC)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice (of New Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of )
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (as to City of L.A.)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (as to L.A. Police Department (not named in petition))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (electronic service of reply brief on L.A. City Attorney)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (of reply brief on Michael Moore)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (OF OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Ntc of Lodging Joint Appendix)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (on City of Angeles of the reply brief.)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (of reply brief on L.A. City Attorney)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (OF OPENING BRIEF ON COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENTS)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Petition (writ of Administative Mandamus)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue trial)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (as to City of L.A.)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice (of New Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (as to L.A. Police Department (not named in petition))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.