Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Corte Bella Country Club Association Inc., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Baillio Austin, against Brooks Peggy A., Brooks Stanley A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Upinder S. Kalra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUpinder S. Kalra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2020 |
CategoryOther Enforcement Of Judgment Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Corte Bella Country Club Association, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 22, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment
Date: September 29, 2020Judgment - Judgment Judgment Based on Sister-State Judgment
Date: September 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 29, 2020First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: September 29, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)
Date: September 17, 2021Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: September 22, 2021Motion to Amend Judgment - Motion to Amend Judgment
Date: September 22, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment)
Date: December 22, 2021Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Corte Bella Country Club Association, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment) of 12/22/2021; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 22, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.