Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Kingsley Hardy Matthew Donald, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: September 09, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 09, 2020Petition for Change of Name
Date: September 09, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 09, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]
Date: September 11, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: September 11, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: October 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: January 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: January 21, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 01/12/2021)
Date: January 12, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: January 12, 2021Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.