Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lifshultz Joseph, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Stuart Gordon, Stuart Gordon C. Esq., against Bezzasso Todd, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Upinder S. Kalra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryPetition To Compel/Confirm/Vacate Arbitration (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Status Report; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Affidavit OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Affidavit Affidavit of Due Diligence; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner); As to: TODD BEZZASSO (Respondent)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Updated -- Judgment: Filed By: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: February 15, 2022Updated -- Order for Publication: Filed By: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Application for Publication; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner); As to: TODD BEZZASSO (Respondent)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Application for Publication; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner); As to: TODD BEZZASSO (Respondent)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: September 04, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 04, 2020First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: September 04, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 30, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)
Date: February 10, 2021Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit Affidavit of Due Diligence
Date: March 24, 2021Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit OF DUE DILIGENCE
Date: March 24, 2021Status Report - Status Report
Date: April 01, 2021Status Report - Status Report
Date: July 01, 2021Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: July 12, 2021Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: September 02, 2021Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continuance
Date: October 08, 2021Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: October 08, 2021Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Todd
Date: October 13, 2021Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: October 21, 2021Order for Publication - Order for Publication
Date: October 26, 2021Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: November 29, 2021Judgment - Judgment
Date: February 15, 2022Affidavit OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner); As to: TODD BEZZASSO (Respondent)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Affidavit Affidavit of Due Diligence; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Application for Publication; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner); As to: TODD BEZZASSO (Respondent)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Application for Publication; Filed by: JOSEPH LIFSHULTZ (Petitioner); As to: TODD BEZZASSO (Respondent)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.