Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Asset Security Consulting Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Shafai John, against Asset Security Consulting Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time64 days |
Status Report; Filed by: Ladderstile Company, LLC (Non-Party)
Date: September 22, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: Asset Security Consulting, LLC (Respondent)
Date: June 16, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 30, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: July 07, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 07, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 10, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 28, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: September 02, 2020Status Report
Date: September 22, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 02, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Petition (Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel Shaughnessy in Support of Motion to Intervene)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Order (RE: PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTERED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Petition for Approval of Transfer...))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.