Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Duarte Juarez Maira E., The Academy Of Motion Picture Arts And Sciences, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Hermansen Kevin, Ramm Benjamin G., Tayback Christopher, against The Academy Of Motion Picture Arts And Sciences, Ward David S., represented by Friedman Ira M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Samantha P. Jessner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2020 |
CategoryAdministrative Agency Award (Not Unpaid Taxes) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint was electronically filed by the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles on April 2, 2021. The attorneys representing the Plaintiff-Intervenor, Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences, are Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sulliv...
Reply (brief)
Date: April 16, 2021Order re: For Delivery of Property After Examination; Filed by: As to: David S. Ward (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Maira E. Duarte Juarez (Appellant)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Maira E. Duarte Juarez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maira E. Duarte Juarez (Plaintiff); As to: David S. Ward (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Appellate Order Granting Relief from Default B313272, NA; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Brief opening by Maira Duarte Juarez; Filed by: Maira E. Duarte Juarez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Appeal/Status Report) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Appeal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - B313272 - NOA ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: David S. Ward (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Declaration of Kevin Hermansen; Filed by: Maira E. Duarte Juarez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA- B313272 Reporter Fee's; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Declaration Of Michael Fazio; Filed by: The Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Maira E. Duarte Juarez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Motion for Order Extending ORAP Lien, CCP 708.110(d); Filed by: Maira E. Duarte Juarez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: The Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Maira E. Duarte Juarez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Maira E. Duarte Juarez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Maira E. Duarte Juarez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: David S. Ward (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - B313272 - NOA ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B313272, NA06-01-21;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Reply brief; Filed by: Maira E. Duarte Juarez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: The Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Academy of Motion Picture Arts and Sciences (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B313272; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 15, 2023Request of the Labor Commissioner that Clerk Enter Judgment
Date: June 25, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 25, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: September 17, 2020Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: September 18, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: September 24, 2020Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (ORANGE)
Date: September 25, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: November 17, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)
Date: December 02, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: January 27, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: February 03, 2021Complaint in Intervention
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)
Date: February 18, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 19, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 11, 2021Writ - Return
Date: March 30, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: April 01, 2021Association of Attorney
Date: April 01, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN HERMANSEN
Date: April 02, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: April 01, 2021Brief - BRIEF OPENING BY MAIRA DUARTE JUAREZ
Date: April 02, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 02, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 16, 2021Answer
Date: April 28, 2021Writ - Return
Date: May 25, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: May 28, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: June 07, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: June 10, 2021Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: June 18, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: June 23, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: July 08, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 15, 2021Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER EXTENDING ORAP LIEN, CCP 708.110(D)
Date: July 28, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER EXTENDING ORAP LIEN, CCP 708.110(D)
Date: August 17, 2021Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - APPEAL - NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE - B313272 - NOA 6/1/21
Date: October 07, 2021Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL B313272, NA06-01-21;
Date: October 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: APPEAL)
Date: April 12, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: APPEAL)
Date: June 01, 2022Status Report
Date: September 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: APPEAL/STATUS REPORT)
Date: March 16, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: May 10, 2023Brief (in Support of Order for Delivery of Property After Examination RE Academy Award)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment) of )
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (Of Michael Fazio)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other re: Pending Issues; Non-Appearance Case Revie...))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Order Extending ORAP Lien, CCP 708.110(d))
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination))
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Extend Briefing Schedule)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin Hermansen)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B313272, NA06-01-21; PER 8.140(b))
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Appellate Order Granting Relief from Default (B313272, NA)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Benjamin Ramm in Support of Motion for Leave to File a Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (NOA- B313272 Reporter Fee's)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Request of the Labor Commissioner that Clerk Enter Judgment
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Brief (opening by Maira Duarte Juarez)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Brief (THE ACADEMY OF MOTION PICTURE ARTS AND SCIENCES? OPENING BRIEF RE RIGHT OF FIRST REFUSAL)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (- B313272 - NOA )
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order extending ORAP lien, CCP 708.110(d)))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Motion for Order (Extending ORAP Lien, CCP 708.110(d))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Leave to File a Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Extend Briefing Schedule))
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (- B313272 - NOA )
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Appeal))
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment) of 09/17/2020)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Brief (in Support of Order for Delivery of Property After Examination RE Academy Award)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Leave to File a Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin Hermansen)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Brief (THE ACADEMY OF MOTION PICTURE ARTS AND SCIENCES? OPENING BRIEF RE RIGHT OF FIRST REFUSAL)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Extend Briefing Schedule))
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Reply (brief)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Benjamin Ramm in Support of Motion for Leave to File a Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other re: Pending Issues; Non-Appearance Case Revie...))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination))
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Declaration (Of Michael Fazio)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Brief (opening by Maira Duarte Juarez)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Extend Briefing Schedule)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Order Extending ORAP Lien, CCP 708.110(d))
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Motion for Order (Extending ORAP Lien, CCP 708.110(d))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees
Date: September 17, 2020Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: September 17, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 01, 2020Order - ORDER RE: FOR DELIVERY OF PROPERTY AFTER EXAMINATION
Date: December 02, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 28, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 28, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 01, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FAZIO
Date: April 01, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Declaration (Of Michael Fazio)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.