Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mr. Daniels Inc. Dba Blakeslee Recording Company, Saadiq Raphael, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Szabo Lawrence Jay, against Jackson Julian, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 30, 2020Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Raphael Saadiq (Petitioner); Mr. Daniels, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Raphael Saadiq (Petitioner); Mr. Daniels, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 30, 2020First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: June 24, 2020Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: June 24, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service
Date: July 17, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 05, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 01, 2020Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 23, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Of Lawrence Szabo Re Fees and Costs
Date: November 23, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Liens Should Not Be Stricken)
Date: December 01, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Liens Should Not Be Stricken)
Date: December 28, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: December 30, 2020Order (name extension) - Order [PROPOSED] ORDER STRIKING AND RELEASING LIENS ON PROPERTY
Date: January 21, 2021Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Raphael Saadiq (Petitioner); Mr. Daniels, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Raphael Saadiq (Petitioner); Mr. Daniels, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.