Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Clark Bryan C., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fasen Leo, against Capri Court Homes Ii Association, Dennis Marlene, Fidelity National Title Company, Peninsula Law Apc, Playa Vista Parks And Landscape Corporation, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Elaine W. Mandel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 30, 2020Complaint
Date: November 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 30, 2020Complaint
Date: November 30, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 30, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PART APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: December 01, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 30, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 01, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 01, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: June 29, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed by Bryan C. Clark (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Bryan C. Clark (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Bryan C. Clark (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Bryan C. Clark (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bryan C. Clark (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Part Application for Tempo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Bryan C. Clark (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Bryan C. Clark (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Bryan C. Clark (Plaintiff)
Date: June 29, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Bryan C. Clark (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Part Application for Tempo...))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Part Application for Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.