Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Xxxxxxxx Xxxxx, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Movroydis Aron, against Xxxxxxx Xxxxxx, Xxxxxxx Xxx, Xxxxxxx L. Xxxxxxx Trustee Of The Xxxxxxx L. Robins Revocable Trust Dated March 12 2012, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Helen Zukin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Eviction Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Complaint
Date: November 17, 2020Complaint
Date: November 17, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 17, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 17, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 17, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: November 17, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 17, 2020Answer
Date: January 04, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: January 04, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 05, 2021Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: January 08, 2021Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: February 03, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 03, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 05, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 11, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 11, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 07, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: July 08, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 13, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 13, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: September 15, 2021Order - ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: September 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 04, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 04, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 05, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 10, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 09, 2022Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice (of Deposit of First Filing Fee)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Order (Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: February 10, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 09, 2022Stipulation and Order (AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT; [PROPOSED] ORDER)
Date: January 19, 2022Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.