Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garcia Orlando, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Handy Russell Clive, against La Peer Hotel Owner Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Harry Jay Ford III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarry Jay Ford III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: LA Peer Hotel Owner LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: LA Peer Hotel Owner LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LA Peer Hotel Owner LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: LA Peer Hotel Owner LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 03, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 03, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 03, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 05, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 25, 2021Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: February 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: February 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 03, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE PURSUANT TO L.A.S.C. LOCAL RULE 3.22
Date: June 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: June 22, 2021Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: July 18, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 13, 2023Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by LA Peer Hotel Owner LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Stay of Proceedings) Filed by LA Peer Hotel Owner LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by LA Peer Hotel Owner LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Completio...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LA Peer Hotel Owner LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Completio...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice (of Status of Removed Case Pursuant to L.A.S.C. Local Rule 3.22)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 05/03/2021)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Stay of Proceedings)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Completio...))
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.