Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barrett Mary, Rodriguez Felipe, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Montoya Thierry R., Ross Barry Alan, against 1401 Camden Inc., 1401 Camden Inc. Association, represented by Lawrence Lisa, Lucas Timothy Dean, Mulvihill Cynthia Coulter, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Helen Zukin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Stipulation and [Proposed] Partial MIL #6; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Objection and Response to Declaration of Thierry R. Montoya; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Objection Objection to Notice of Ruling; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Ex Parte Application; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-01T00:00:00Order Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Lodging NOTICE OF LODGMENT; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-17T00:00:00Order [Proposed] Order; Signed and Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Stipulation and [Proposed] Partial MIL #12; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Cynthia Coulter Mulvihill (Attorney)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Brief MSC Brief; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: BARRY Alan ROSS (Attorney)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motions to Compel; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine No 2 re SOL SOR; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of IDC re Order Shortening Time for Site Inspection; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Reply to Defendants Opposition to Motion to Exclude; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: January 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 02, 2021Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER
Date: July 14, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE /TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: September 03, 2021Order - ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: September 15, 2021Answer
Date: September 14, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: September 21, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE / CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 02, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: October 01, 2021Joint Status Conference Report
Date: October 22, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: March 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: January 21, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: June 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENC...)
Date: November 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2022Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: March 09, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: March 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: April 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: April 22, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: April 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: August 22, 2022Joint Status Conference Report
Date: September 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: September 27, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 10, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SANCTIONS
Date: November 18, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC) REQUESTED BY DEFENDANT)
Date: November 28, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING TRANSCRIPT EXHIBITS OF FELIPE RODRIGUEZ
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING TRANSCRIPT OF KATHIE KENT
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING TRANSCRIPT OF FELIPE RODRIGUEZ
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING TRANSCRIPT EXHIBITS OF KATHIE KENT
Date: November 29, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 29, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 01, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 05, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: December 14, 2022Separate Statement
Date: December 15, 2022Separate Statement
Date: December 19, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 - PARTIAL RE LAW WITNESS EXPERT OPINION
Date: December 27, 2022Motion in Limine - STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: December 27, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PARTIAL MIL #3
Date: December 27, 2022Motion in Limine - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PARTIAL MIL #6
Date: December 27, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: December 27, 2022Motion in Limine - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PARTIAL MIL #11
Date: December 27, 2022Motion in Limine - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PARTIAL MIL #12
Date: December 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS THREE MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: December 27, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: January 03, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 2 RE SOL SOR
Date: December 27, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY TO CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: January 03, 2023Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF MEET AND CONFER
Date: January 03, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE 3
Date: January 03, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE 2
Date: January 03, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE CONFUSING EVIDENCE
Date: January 04, 2023Statement of the Case
Date: January 05, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF IDC RE ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR SITE INSPECTION
Date: January 09, 2023Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2023Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE
Date: January 09, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: January 11, 2023Association of Attorney
Date: January 24, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: February 01, 2023Informal Discovery Conference
Date: February 06, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC) REQUESTED BY PLAINTIFF)
Date: February 09, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: February 15, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 16, 2023Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 1987
Date: February 24, 2023Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RULING
Date: February 27, 2023Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: March 08, 2023Separate Statement
Date: March 08, 2023Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS’ MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF
Date: March 08, 2023Brief - BRIEF MSC BRIEF
Date: March 10, 2023Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION
Date: March 10, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: March 17, 2023Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: March 27, 2023Objection - OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO DECLARATION OF THIERRY R. MONTOYA
Date: March 27, 2023Witness List
Date: April 03, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF LITIGATION
Date: May 10, 2023Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF IDC HEARING
Date: May 10, 2023Stipulation and [Proposed] Partial MIL #11; Filed by: 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 06, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION
Date: August 06, 2020Complaint
Date: August 06, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION CERTIFICATE OF EFFORTS TO RESOLVE DISPUTE
Date: August 06, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 06, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 24, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: September 24, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 24, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference /Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Answer (to the Complaint) Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Order (Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Barry Alan Ross (Attorney)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Status Conference Re: Me...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference / Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order) Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Mandatory Settlement Conferenc...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Electronic Service) Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Mediation; Informal Discovery Conferenc...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Compliance) Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine No 2 re SOL SOR Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Production of Documents at Deposi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Stipulation and [Proposed] Partial MIL #12 Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Cynthia Coulter Mulvihill (Attorney)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Electronic Service) Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants Opposition to Motion to Exclude) Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) requested by Defendant)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Stipulation and [Proposed] Partial MIL #6 Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Stipulation and [Proposed] Partial MIL #11 Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Notice (of IDC re Order Shortening Time for Site Inspection) Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Protective Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by 1401 Camden Inc. Association (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Felipe Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Mary Barrett (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of Mandatory Settlement Conferenc...) of )
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference / Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Order (Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Mandatory Settlement Conferenc...))
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Answer (to the Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference /Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference))
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order))
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum and Statement of Location)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (to Policies and Procedures for Judicial Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Electronic Service)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Declaration (Certificate of Efforts to Resolve Dispute)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing))
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Declaration (Certificate of Efforts to Resolve Dispute)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Answer (to the Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum and Statement of Location)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.