Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Az Air Conditioning & Heating Inc. Roe 10, C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists, D. Br Premium Inc Aka D.Br Roofing & Architectural Metal, Fleetwood Windows & Doors, Flexi-Tech Contracting Inc. A California Corporation, (total of 10) See All filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kent Larry, against A-1 Apex Plumbing Inc., Arcadia Inc., Az Air Conditioning And Heating Inc., Certified Tile & Stone Inc., Certified Title Llc Dba Certified Title & Marble, (total of 21) See All represented by Allton Joshua D., Bregman David, Bromgard Todd, Bullard James E, Coppola Carlo A, (total of 23) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Elaine W. Mandel presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Julie Testa (Attorney)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Abraham "Avi" Steinlauf (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by: RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00; Default not entered as to IC Electric, Inc. On the Cross-Complaint filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. on
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Default entered as to RT Abbott Construction, Inc. On the Cross-Complaint filed by D. BR Premium, Inc on
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00On the Cross-Complaint filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00On the Cross-Complaint filed by D. BR Premium, Inc on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Drytech Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: JMI STEEL, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Abraham "Avi" Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: February 20, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 20, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 20, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 06, 2020Answer
Date: March 17, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 17, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: March 17, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 23, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 24, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 24, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 07, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: April 07, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 07, 2020Answer
Date: April 16, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 01, 2020Answer
Date: May 19, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: May 19, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: June 04, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY
Date: June 19, 2020Answer
Date: July 22, 2020Answer
Date: July 29, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: July 29, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 04, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF LARRY KENT RE [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: August 04, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2020Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 12, 2020Answer
Date: August 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 18, 2020Answer
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: September 09, 2020Answer
Date: August 26, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 10, 2020Answer
Date: September 11, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: September 15, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: September 23, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 01, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 06, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 14, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 16, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: October 16, 2020Answer
Date: October 16, 2020Order - ORDER PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: October 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 09, 2020Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: November 09, 2020Answer
Date: November 12, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: November 17, 2020Answer
Date: November 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 18, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: November 18, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 19, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 08, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 11, 2020Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: December 14, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: December 15, 2020Answer
Date: December 21, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 28, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: December 21, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 29, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: January 20, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 20, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 20, 2021Association of Attorney
Date: January 25, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: January 22, 2021Answer
Date: February 09, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 16, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 16, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 12, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: March 16, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: March 17, 2021Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 17, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 23, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY
Date: March 23, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: April 05, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 05, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 05, 2021Answer
Date: April 05, 2021Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: April 06, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 16, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 16, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: April 16, 2021Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: April 29, 2021Answer
Date: April 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEYS
Date: May 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR DBR PREMIUM, INC.
Date: May 07, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING RE APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS
Date: May 19, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 20, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: May 28, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: May 28, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: June 10, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 16, 2021Answer
Date: June 23, 2021Objection - OBJECTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER OBJECTIONS
Date: June 23, 2021Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 25, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 30, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: July 01, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: July 06, 2021Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: July 12, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S 998 OFFER TO COMPROMISE
Date: July 13, 2021Answer
Date: July 14, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: July 14, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: July 14, 2021Request for Refund / Order
Date: July 16, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: July 21, 2021Answer
Date: July 21, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 21, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 21, 2021Brief - BRIEF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 21, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 26, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: July 26, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: July 27, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 27, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 28, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 28, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: July 28, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 29, 2021Answer
Date: July 29, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: July 30, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: August 02, 2021Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: August 03, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 02, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: August 04, 2021Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: August 04, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 04, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 04, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 05, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 06, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 10, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 16, 2021Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 19, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 20, 2021Answer
Date: August 20, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 24, 2021Motion to Challenge the Good Faith of a Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: August 27, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL
Date: August 30, 2021Answer; Filed by: JMI Steel, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); As to: HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Default entered as to IC Electric, Inc. On the Cross-Complaint filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. on
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: SMA Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: FLEXI-TECH CONTRACTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: SMA Builders (Cross-Defendant); As to: HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Steven Alan Sobel (Attorney)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: A-1 APEX PLUMBING, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorneys; Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Signed and Filed by: A-1 Apex Plumbing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00; Default not entered as to IC Electric, Inc. On the Cross-Complaint filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. on
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: D. BR Premium, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: FLEXI-TECH CONTRACTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00; Default not entered as to WDHI, Incorporated; On the Cross-Complaint filed by Mayer Losen Maceka on
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Reply To Opposition; Filed by: HMJ Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Drytech Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Flexi-Tech Contracting, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Drytech Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: American Products Coatings (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Drytech Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: American Product Coatings (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00On the Cross-Complaint filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: AZ AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Objection Case Management Order Objections; Filed by: A-1 APEX PLUMBING, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability; Filed by: RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: September 03, 2021Answer
Date: September 03, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF RAYCON ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.S DESIGNATION OF PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGABLE
Date: September 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 16, 2021Answer
Date: September 17, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 21, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 21, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 21, 2021Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: September 21, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: September 22, 2021Joinder
Date: September 23, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: September 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: October 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR GOOD ...)
Date: September 30, 2021Answer
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 01, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 04, 2021Association of Attorney
Date: October 12, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 14, 2021Answer
Date: October 19, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 21, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 26, 2021Order - ORDER RECOMMENDATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER NO. 1 RE: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TIMELINE
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 26, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 27, 2021Notice - NOTICE REFERENCE
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 29, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 29, 2021Answer
Date: October 29, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 29, 2021Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: November 03, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 03, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: November 03, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 04, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 04, 2021Answer
Date: November 12, 2021Order - ORDER RECOMMENDATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER NO. 3 RE: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TIMELINE
Date: November 17, 2021Order - RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER NO. 3 RE: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TIMELINE
Date: November 17, 2021Answer
Date: November 24, 2021Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: November 30, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 02, 2021Notice of Continuance
Date: December 07, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND ORDER THEREON
Date: December 09, 2021Answer
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: December 14, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 17, 2021Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: December 17, 2021Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: December 21, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 21, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: December 22, 2021Answer
Date: December 22, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: January 11, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 12, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 18, 2022Joint Status Conference Report
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: January 19, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: January 21, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 21, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 21, 2022Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: January 24, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 25, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 26, 2022Answer
Date: January 26, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: January 26, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 27, 2022Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 27, 2022Answer
Date: January 27, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 01, 2022Association of Attorney
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: February 03, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: February 07, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 03, 2022Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: February 09, 2022Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: February 15, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE AND TIME
Date: February 16, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: February 16, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF MAILING
Date: February 16, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. WOOLFALL
Date: February 16, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 16, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: February 18, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 22, 2022Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: February 16, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: March 08, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 18, 2022Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: February 28, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 03, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: March 09, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 11, 2022Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 15, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: March 16, 2022Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: March 16, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 17, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: March 17, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 29, 2022Notice - OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY
Date: March 30, 2022Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: April 11, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: April 11, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 11, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 18, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: April 19, 2022Answer
Date: April 19, 2022Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: April 19, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 20, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: April 20, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: April 29, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: May 02, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: June 20, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: July 07, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: July 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: July 15, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY
Date: July 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 19, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 19, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: July 21, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 22, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 25, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: October 03, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 27, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION RE CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE
Date: October 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: October 14, 2022Status Conference Statement
Date: October 24, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER CONTINUING FINAL STATUS CONFRENCE AND TRIAL DATES
Date: October 25, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: November 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 02, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: December 01, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: December 27, 2022Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: December 28, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 22, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by: Bruce Lorber (Attorney)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 12, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by SMA Builders (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by J.M.I. STEEL, INC., a California corporation (Doe 2) (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Valley Builders Erroneously Sued As Valley Builders Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by AZ AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Handling Attorneys) Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Answer Filed by JMI Steel, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by Flexitech Contracting, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Association of Counsel for DBR Premium, Inc.) Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Valley Builders Erroneously Sued As Valley Builders Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by SMA Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff); Shulamit "Shuli" Bendheim Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Summons (on Amendment to Cross Complaint) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by SMA Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by AZ Air Conditioning & Heating, Inc. (Roe 10) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order and Publication of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by American Product Coatings (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Steven Alan Sobel (Attorney)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Mayer Losen Maceka (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Mayer Losen Maceka (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal) Filed by Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Stipulation to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Abraham "Avi" Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by AZ AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Remote Appearance) Filed by RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by HEATHER R. WHITEHEAD (Attorney)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by Drytech Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Filed by Drytech Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Motion to Challenge the Good Faith of a Settlement (CCP 877.6); Filed by: D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Hearing Date And Time) Filed by Raycon Environmental, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by FLEXI-TECH CONTRACTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Abraham "Avi" Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by JMI STEEL, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by SMA Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Abraham "Avi" Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Raycon Environmental Construction (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by AZ Air Conditioning & Heating, Inc. (Roe 10) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by FLEXI-TECH CONTRACTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Opposition to Application for Good ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Drytech Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by American Product Coatings (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Remote Appearance) Filed by RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Mailing) Filed by Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Drytech Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Objection (Case Management Order Objections) Filed by A-1 APEX PLUMBING, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Filed by Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability Filed by RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint) Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Motion to Challenge the Good Faith of a Settlement (CCP 877.6) Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mayer Losen Maceka (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Raycon Environmental, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Drytech Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by A-1 APEX PLUMBING, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by FLEXI-TECH CONTRACTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Flexitech Contracting, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Valley Builders Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint) Filed by Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mayer Losen Maceka (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by AZ Air Conditioning & Heating, Inc. (Roe 10) (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Joinder Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mayer Losen Maceka (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Determinati...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Mayer Losen Maceka (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by A-1 APEX PLUMBING, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by FLEXI-TECH CONTRACTING, INC. (MOE 1) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Drytech Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Filed by Mayer Losen Maceka (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Julie Testa (Attorney)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by FLEXI-TECH CONTRACTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Fleetwood Aluminum Products, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by American Products Coatings (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by FLEXI-TECH CONTRACTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Paul Herrera Construction (Roe 13) (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00DECLARATION OF LARRY KENT RE [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Filed by Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by A-1 APEX PLUMBING, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Mayer Losen Maceka (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney Filed by RT Abbott Construction, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by A-1 Apex Plumbing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice (OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00DECLARATION OF LARRY KENT RE [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Order (Proposed Case Management Order)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice (OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Summons (on Amendment to Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice (OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANT HMJ CONSTRUCTION, INC.S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Association of Counsel for DBR Premium, Inc.)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling re Application for Publication of Summons)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Handling Attorneys)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice (Consent for Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Objection (Case Management Order Objections)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order and Publication of Summons)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's 998 Offer to Compromise)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Brief (JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order and Publication of ...))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Motion to Challenge the Good Faith of a Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Opposition to Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Notice (OF RAYCON ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.S DESIGNATION OF PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGABLE)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Request (CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Opposition to Application for Good ...))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Stipulation to Set Aside Entry of Default and Order Thereon
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Compalint)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian D. Woolfall)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Abraham Avi Steinlauf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by FLEXI-TECH CONTRACTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Fleetwood Windows & Doors (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by Padilla's Company, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by D.BR Premium, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order) Filed by K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney Filed by Bruce Lorber (Attorney)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by A-1 Apex Plumbing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by A-1 Apex Plumbing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by K.J.E. Sheet Metal, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Mayer Losen Maceka (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by HMJ Construction, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by D. BR Premium, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by Mayer Losen Maceka (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by AZ Air Conditioning & Heating, Inc. (Roe 10) (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Flexi-Tech Contracting, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Mailing)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Hearing Date And Time)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Mailing)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of David Bregman iso of the App for Determination of Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Order on J.M.I. Steel, Inc.'s Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Order (Granting Valley Builders' Application Good Faith Settlement Determination)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Electronic Service)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Order Granting Paul Herrera's Application for Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Order (Determining Good Faith Settlement by Mayer Loson Maceka dba Certified Tile and Marble)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in Support of Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Notice (of Attorney Unavailability)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re: Continuance of Trial)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Notice (OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Order (Proposed Case Management Order)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Summons (on Amendment to Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice (OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice (OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice (Consent for Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order and Publication of Summons)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Handling Attorneys)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Association of Counsel for DBR Premium, Inc.)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order and Publication of ...))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANT HMJ CONSTRUCTION, INC.S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Recommendation and Order No. 2 Re: Response to CMO Discovery by Padilla's Grading
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Set Aside Default Against Paul Herrera Construction)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Recommendation and Order No. 3 Re: Case Management Order Timeline
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion for Good Faith Settlement; Declaration of Todd D. Bromgard; [Proposed] Order
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00OPPOSITION BY DBR PREMIUM, INC. TO GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF HMJ CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Order Granting Motion for Good Faith Settlement of HMJ Construction, Inc. and Joseph Kaplan
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Order Granting C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists' Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Stipulation to Set Aside Default and Order Thereon
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Notice (REFERENCE)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice (OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Order (RECOMMENDATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER NO. 1 RE: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TIMELINE)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF OPPOSITION BY DBR PREMIUM, INC. TO GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF HMJ CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (complaint)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Determinati...))
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00C.G.S. Custom Glass Specialists Reply in Support of its Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice (OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Opposition to Application for Good ...))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Determinati...))
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Order (RECOMMENDATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER NO. 1 RE: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TIMELINE)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice (REFERENCE)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (complaint)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice (OF ATTORNEY UNAVAILABILITY)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00OPPOSITION BY DBR PREMIUM, INC. TO GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF HMJ CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF OPPOSITION BY DBR PREMIUM, INC. TO GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF HMJ CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice (OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00DEFENDANT / CROSS-DEFENDANT A-1 APEX PLUMBING, INC.?S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Mailing)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (of David Bregman iso of the App for Determination of Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Mailing)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian D. Woolfall)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Hearing Date And Time)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Order (Granting Valley Builders' Application Good Faith Settlement Determination)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Order (Determining Good Faith Settlement by Mayer Loson Maceka dba Certified Tile and Marble)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling re Application for Publication of Summons)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Objection (Case Management Order Objections)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Request (CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's 998 Offer to Compromise)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Brief (JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Set Aside Default Against Paul Herrera Construction)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Motion to Challenge the Good Faith of a Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice (OF RAYCON ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.S DESIGNATION OF PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGABLE)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.