Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Armistead Lauren, Armistead Susan, Gelt Inc., Wasserman Gelena, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Behrendt Kevin, against Gelt Inc., Wasserman Gelena, Wasserman Keith, represented by Endler Jeffrey Brad, Kirkpatrick Cheryl, Shapiro Jeffrey S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark H. Epstein presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management182 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Answer; Filed by: Lauren Armistead (Cross-Defendant); Susan Armistead (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Gelt, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Gelena Wasserman (Defendant); Keith Wasserman (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Gelena Wasserman (Defendant); Keith Wasserman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lauren Armistead (Plaintiff); Susan Armistead (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Declaration of Peter C.L. Chen; Filed by: Gelena Wasserman (Defendant); Keith Wasserman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Lauren Armistead (Plaintiff); Susan Armistead (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Gelt, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Gelena Wasserman (Defendant); Keith Wasserman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike; Filed by: Lauren Armistead (Plaintiff); Susan Armistead (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Gelena Wasserman (Defendant); Keith Wasserman (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gelena Wasserman (Defendant); Keith Wasserman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gelena Wasserman (Defendant); Keith Wasserman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gelena Wasserman (Defendant); Keith Wasserman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lauren Armistead (Plaintiff); Susan Armistead (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00General Denial; Filed by: Gelt, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Gelena Wasserman (Defendant); Keith Wasserman (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 17, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 18, 2023Complaint
Date: January 06, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 06, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 07, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: April 29, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: May 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 29, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 06, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 06, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 21, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: September 15, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)
Date: September 25, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: October 14, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: October 14, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 21, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: October 29, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: October 29, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 29, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 22, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: November 09, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2021Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT GELT INC.'S REPLY BRIEF TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FAC, ETC.
Date: January 14, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS’ OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 14, 2021Answer - TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2021General Denial
Date: February 22, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: February 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 24, 2021Answer
Date: March 29, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: May 06, 2021Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: May 03, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 17, 2021Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Date: May 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: May 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 09, 2022Witness List
Date: January 06, 2023Jury Instructions
Date: January 06, 2023Statement of the Case
Date: January 06, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 09, 2023Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE TRIAL DATE
Date: April 19, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE)
Date: April 20, 2023Declaration (Declaration of Katherine S. Agbayani in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Peter C.L. Chen)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF SUSAN ARMISTEAD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF KEVIN BEHRENDT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffrey B. Endler, Esq. ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Endler)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Reply (Defendant Gelt Inc.'s Reply Brief to Opposition to Demurrer to FAC, etc.)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike Certain Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Gelena Wasserman ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Endler)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Reply (memorandum in support of motion to disqualify)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Reply (Defendant Gelt Inc.'s Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion to Strike, etc.)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.