Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hernandez-Hudgins Francisco Gerald Aka Francisco Gerald Johnson, Hernandez-Hudgins Francisco Gerald, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Lawrence Cho presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: September 04, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: September 04, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 04, 2020Petition for Change of Name
Date: September 04, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: November 03, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 04, 2020Decree Changing Name
Date: November 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: November 13, 2020Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: November 13, 2020Proof of Publication; Filed by: Clerk; Service Costs Waived: No
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Francisco Gerald Hernandez-Hudgins (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Clerk
Date: November 13, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Francisco Gerald Hernandez-Hudgins (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Francisco Gerald Hernandez-Hudgins (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Francisco Gerald Hernandez-Hudgins (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by:
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Francisco Gerald Hernandez-Hudgins (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Decree Changing Name
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.