Pier Proprietary Fund Lp,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Atabek Jon A.,
Mccormick Sean Andrew,
against
Talahuron Alfred,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
Santa Monica.
Case Details for
Pier Proprietary Fund Lp v. Talahuron Alfred
Case Events for
Pier Proprietary Fund Lp v. Talahuron Alfred
Date
Type
Description
August 28, 2023
Docket Event
Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Pier Proprietary Fund, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Alfred Talahuron (Defendant); County: Los Angeles; Principal: 5934835.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00
August 21, 2023
Docket Event
Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Pier Proprietary Fund, LP (Plaintiff)
July 10, 2020
Docket Event
Updated -- Confession of Judgment: Filed By: Pier Proprietary Fund, LP (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
July 10, 2020
Docket Event
Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Pier Proprietary Fund, LP against Defendant Alfred Talahuron on the Petition filed by Pier Proprietary Fund, LP on for damages of $5,424,990.00, interest of $509,800.00, and costs of $45.00 for a total of $5,934,835.00.
June 26, 2020
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department M Santa Monica Courthouse
June 15, 2020
Docket Event
Updated -- Confession of Judgment: Status Date changed from to
June 15, 2020
Docket Event
Confession of Judgment; Filed by: Pier Proprietary Fund, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Alfred Talahuron (Defendant)
June 15, 2020
Docket Event
Attorney's Declaration ISO Confession of Judgment; Filed by: Pier Proprietary Fund, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Alfred Talahuron (Defendant)
June 15, 2020
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pier Proprietary Fund, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Alfred Talahuron (Defendant)