Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Siegel Annie, Siegel Oren, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Lawrence Cho presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Cycle Time153 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 31, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 31, 2020Petition for Change of Name
Date: January 31, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name to Conform to Gender Identity
Date: January 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 24, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/24/2020
Date: March 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: May 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 02, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name to Conform to Gender Identity
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: July 02, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/24/2020)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/12/2020)
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name, Recognition of Change of Gender, and Issuance of New Birth Certificate
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: July 02, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.