Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Betty Wilkins filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Beth A. R. McGowen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims Appeals |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Minute Order
Date: December 09, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 14, 2021Hearing: Small Claims Appeal
Date: December 09, 2020Hearing: Small Claims Appeal
Date: April 14, 2021Request to Pay Judgment in Installments
Date: May 13, 2021Judgment
Date: December 17, 2020Order
Date: April 14, 2021Order
Date: June 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Make Payments filed 06/24/21. ORDER: Approved. (View order for full details.) | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS of: Order on Request to Make Payments filed 06/24/21. |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Pay Judgment in Installments | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 14, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing: Small Claims Appeal | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order After Trial De Novo |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned/Undeliverable Mail | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned/Undeliverable Mail Order on Request for Court Order filed 02/04/21. |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: Request for Court Order (Small Claims) ORDER: The request is granted. You must go to court if you want to be heard. A hearing on this request is scheduled as follows: April 14, 2021, 10:00 am, Dept. 22. Bring evidence to the hearing to support your request.Small claims appeal dismissed in December is rescheduled and parties ordered to appear. Honorable Beth McGowen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.