Case Last Refreshed: 23 hours ago
Helf Scott, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Deniro Michael Joseph, against Western University Of Health Sciences, represented by Ayers Kamala Howard, Bhimani Arti L, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Geanene M. Yriarte presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint; Filed by: Scott Helf (Plaintiff); As to: Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Reply in Support of Demurrer; Filed by: Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Scott Helf; Filed by: Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Reply Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Tax Costs: Filed By: Scott Helf (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: June 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: June 15, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 21, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SCOTT HELF
Date: June 22, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 22, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 22, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: July 09, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 27, 2021Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: August 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 18, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 16, 2021Request - REQUEST REQUEST TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PROC. 170.6
Date: September 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 16, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 20, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: September 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION .)
Date: September 28, 2021Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: September 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 08, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: November 04, 2021Complaint Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Scott Helf) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Tax Costs) Filed by Scott Helf (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer) Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: November 04, 2021Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Western University of Health Sciences (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application .)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Case) of 06/15/2021)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 05/07/2021)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Scott Helf)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application .))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Motion for Order (Motion for Order to Disqualify Judge Pursuant to Code Civ. Proc. 170.6)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 08/03/2021)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Request (Request to Withdraw Motion to Disqualify Judge Pursuant to Code Civ. Proc. 170.6)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.