Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Supervision Termination - Approval of Final Distribution | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Subsequent Petition Filed Party: Petitioner Hamilton, Christopher J |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting - Subsequent Petition Filed Party: Petitioner Hamilton, Christopher J |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed - Probate / Mental Health | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Creditor's Claim | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim Filed | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim Filed | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Document(s) Returned | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Document(s) Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.