Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2020 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver Filed | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed - Probate / Mental Health | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Received | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Filed Party: Petitioner Harllee, Kathryn Settle |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition Filed | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.