Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cheng Karina Ng, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Delgado Matthew John, against Luu Nial T, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Timothy R. Martella presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Proof of Service - (DV-250) | ||
April 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Department S at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101 Restraining Order Hearing Judge: Timothy R. Martella |
|
April 12, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
April 12, 2021 | Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) | ||
February 25, 2021 | Proof of Service - Amended (DV-250) | ||
February 25, 2021 | Hearing |
Proof of Service (Amended (DV-250) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 24, 2021 | Proof of Service - (DV-250) | ||
February 24, 2021 | Hearing |
Proof of Service ((DV-250) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 03, 2021 | Hearing |
Department S at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101 Restraining Order Hearing Judge: Timothy R. Martella |
|
February 03, 2021 | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.