Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Baldaro Aaron, against Bains Gary Aka Gary S Bains, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Scott R. Herin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Complaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: GARY BAINS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: November 03, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: November 03, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 03, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: November 03, 2020Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: February 04, 2021Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 28, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)
Date: November 09, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice of Order to Show Cause
Date: November 24, 2021Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: December 15, 2021Complaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: GARY BAINS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.