Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Citibank N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jacobsen Devin, against Smith Clifton L Iii, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Andrew C. Kim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Clifton L Smith, III (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Clifton L Smith, III (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Default entered as to Clifton L Smith, III; On the Complaint filed by CITIBANK N.A. on
Date: January 25, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Devin Jacobsen (Attorney)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 04, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: September 04, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 04, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 17, 2020Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: January 25, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: February 09, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Clifton L Smith, III (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Clifton L Smith, III (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.