Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Citibank N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dipiero Anthony, against Sanchez Araceli, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Scott R. Herin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Default Judgment; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Araceli Sanchez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Araceli Sanchez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Araceli Sanchez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Default entered as to Araceli Sanchez; On the Complaint filed by CITIBANK N.A. on
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Araceli Sanchez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 04, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 04, 2020Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: November 05, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 05, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: December 07, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: December 29, 2020Writ - Return - Writ - Return COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES( UNSATISFIED )
Date: April 13, 2022Complaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Araceli Sanchez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Araceli Sanchez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Araceli Sanchez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.