Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Popa Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Smith Jennifer A., against Ruiz Marisa Felix Aka Marisa F Ruiz, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Scott R. Herin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Default entered as to Marisa Felix Ruiz; On the Complaint filed by Popa Federal Credit Union on
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Default entered as to Marisa Felix Ruiz; On the Complaint filed by Popa Federal Credit Union on
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Declaration of Reasonable Diligence; Filed by: Popa Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Popa Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Popa Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Marisa Felix Ruiz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Affidavit of Due Diligence; Filed by: Popa Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: August 27, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: August 27, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 27, 2020Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit of Due Diligence
Date: October 20, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Reasonable Diligence
Date: January 26, 2021Order for Publication - Order for Publication
Date: February 22, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Application for Publication of Summons
Date: February 22, 2021Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: August 16, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)
Date: September 02, 2021Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: September 08, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 30, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 05, 2021Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: October 05, 2021Judgment - Judgment
Date: October 12, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: January 12, 2022Complaint; Filed by: Popa Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Marisa Felix Ruiz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Declaration of Reasonable Diligence; Filed by: Popa Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Affidavit of Due Diligence; Filed by: Popa Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.