Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Department Stores National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Salet Keri L, against Morales Guadalupe, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Yvonne T. Sanchez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYvonne T. Sanchez Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2020 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions181 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Case Cycle Time182 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Guadalupe Morales (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Guadalupe Morales (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: February 27, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: February 27, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: February 27, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 27, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 09, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 26, 2020Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: August 27, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.