Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Department Stores National Bank,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Arrincon-Tepeli Gissela,
against
Moore Larry An Individual,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
with Yvonne T. Sanchez presiding.
Case Details for
Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Department Stores National Bank v. Moore Larry An Individual
Case Events for
Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Department Stores National Bank v. Moore Larry An Individual
Date
Type
Description
June 29, 2020
Docket Event
On the Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Department Stores National Bank on 01/02/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Department Stores National Bank as to the entire action
Judge: Yvonne T. Sanchez
June 29, 2020
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/07/2021 in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/29/2020
Judge: Yvonne T. Sanchez
June 29, 2020
Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
January 06, 2020
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/07/2021 in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A
Judge: Ann H. Park
January 06, 2020
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department A Norwalk Courthouse
January 02, 2020
Docket Event
Complaint; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: LARRY MOORE, an Individual (Defendant)
Judge: Yvonne T. Sanchez
January 02, 2020
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: LARRY MOORE, an Individual (Defendant)
Judge: Yvonne T. Sanchez
January 02, 2020
Docket Event
Declaration of Venue; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: LARRY MOORE, an Individual (Defendant)
Judge: Yvonne T. Sanchez
January 02, 2020
Docket Event
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: LARRY MOORE, an Individual (Defendant)
Judge: Yvonne T. Sanchez
January 02, 2020
Docket Event
Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff); As to: LARRY MOORE, an Individual (Defendant)