Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Norwich Peter T., Rediger Investment Mortgage Fund A California Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Alkana Eugene S., Iloulian Jacob, Wade Stanley, against Acevedo John Daniel Olivas, Gonzalez Luciano Jr., Jp Morgan Chase Bank National Association, Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association, Kohen Abraham Aka, (total of 17) See All represented by Iloulian Jacob, Luczon Diane, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Olivia Rosales presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management172 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2020 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Notice - NOTICE RE MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DEPUTY LUISA BASURTO
Date: March 08, 2023Complaint
Date: March 06, 2020Case Management Statement; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Court Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing held 9-28-21); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Trial Setting Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 2-3-22); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Answer to 3rd Amended Complaint; Filed by: Luciano Gonzalez, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Luciano Gonzalez, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Order /ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (12-8-22); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Rediger Investment Mortgage Fund, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Abraham Kohen (Cross-Defendant); Kohen Financial Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Opposition of Plaintiff to Motion to Exclude Witnesses; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00Brief - Confidential Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Declaration of Eugene Alkana; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Declaration of Eugene Alkana; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: ABRAHAM KOHEN (Defendant); KOHEN FINANCIAL GROUP (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Order /RULING; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Order /ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-15T00:00:00Order /RULING; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: February 17, 2023Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING TO AMEND ITS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: February 27, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 02, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES
Date: March 02, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF EUGENE ALKANA
Date: March 02, 2023Order - ORDER /RULING
Date: March 15, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: March 15, 2023Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: March 21, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 22, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/22/2023
Date: March 22, 2023Affidavit -City of Industry Sheriff's Station; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Kohen Financial Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Separate Statement OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: ABRAHAM KOHEN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Rediger Investment Mortgage Fund, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by Rediger Investment Mortgage Fund, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Rediger Investment Mortgage Fund, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by Luciano Gonzalez, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Kohen Financial Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by ABRAHAM KOHEN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 2-3-22) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Summons On Third Amended Complaint Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Court Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing held 9-28-21) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARINGS (CORRECTED)) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Response to 3rd Amended Complaint) Filed by Luciano Gonzalez, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: regarding...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Answer (to 3rd Amended Complaint) Filed by Luciano Gonzalez, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order-Rescheduling of Time on Hearing Set February 03, ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Answer to Third Amended Complaint Filed by ABRAHAM KOHEN (Defendant); KOHEN FINANCIAL GROUP (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Rediger Investment Mortgage Fund, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Trial Setting Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Eugene Alkana) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (12-8-22) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for An O...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Order (/RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Affidavit (-City of Industry Sheriff's Station) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Order (/RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Separate Statement (OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Rediger Investment Mortgage Fund, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Compliance with ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (continuing trial and FSC; order (proposed)) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Notice (of taking OSC re dismissal off-calendar) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Order (/ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for leave to take a 2nd de...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Monetary Status)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/30/2020)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA CONCERNING REDIGER INVESTMENT MORTGAGE FUND?S VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Answer to Cross Complaint
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Proposed Order for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Proposed Order for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (/ Electronically re: 2nd Amended Complaint/Summons on Diane M Luczon, Esq)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (/ Electronically re: 2nd Amended Complaint/Summons on Joshua Shoumer, Esq)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (re: 2nd Am Complaint and Summons on Luciano Gonzalez, Jr)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (re: 2nd Am Complaint and Summons on Enrique Peralta)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order t...))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Diane Myint Luczon In Support of Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (To Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: regarding...))
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order and Continuance of Hearing on Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order t...))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/28/2021)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Court Ruling on Submitted Matter (Hearing held 9-28-21)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice (Defendant Rediger Investment Morgage Fund's Notice of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (To Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Answer to Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Demurrer To Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARINGS (CORRECTED))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order-Rescheduling of Time on Hearing Set February 03, ...))
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Answer (to 3rd Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 2-3-22)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Response to 3rd Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order t...))
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Motion To Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (Portions of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Summons On Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd)) Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Peter T. Norwich (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.