Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Farm General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Letofsky Brian S, against Greencal Construction Inc Aka Sierra Roof Inc., represented by Morris Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Long Beach with Michael P. Vicencia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseLong Beach |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: GREENCAL CONSTRUCTION INC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: GREENCAL CONSTRUCTION INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request Request to Take Hearing Off Calendar; Filed by: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2020Complaint
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 04, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 04, 2020Answer
Date: October 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 23, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 12, 2021Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: February 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 05, 2021Request - REQUEST REQUEST TO TAKE HEARING OFF CALENDAR
Date: March 15, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: July 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 26, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: August 30, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by GREENCAL CONSTRUCTION INC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: August 23, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Request (Request to Take Hearing Off Calendar) Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by GREENCAL CONSTRUCTION INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Answer (of Defendant Greencal Construction, dba Sierra Roof, Inc.)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.