Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Decoking Descaling Technology Inc. A Texas Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hewitt Michael, against D.D. Technology Inc. A Washington Corporation, represented by Sulentor William, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Long Beach with Mark C. Kim presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management155 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseLong Beach |
Case Cycle Time200 days |
Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: D.D. Technology Inc., a Washington Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Decoking Descaling Technology, Inc., a Texas Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: D.D. Technology Inc., a Washington Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 10, 2020Complaint
Date: February 10, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: February 11, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 14, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: February 18, 2020Order - ORDER PROPOSED EX-PARTE ORDER
Date: February 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD...)
Date: February 19, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: February 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 17, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020
Date: March 17, 2020Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: March 26, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/27/2020
Date: March 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE MCBAIN
Date: April 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 09, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 29, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: June 29, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 01, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TIME CHANGE OF HEARINGS
Date: July 09, 2020Request for Refund / Order
Date: July 13, 2020Other - - TENTATIVE RULING AND FINAL ORDER
Date: July 14, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 15, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: August 28, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed by D.D. Technology Inc., a Washington Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Decoking Descaling Technology, Inc., a Texas Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Decoking Descaling Technology, Inc., a Texas Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Ord...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by D.D. Technology Inc., a Washington Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Decoking Descaling Technology, Inc., a Texas Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Decoking Descaling Technology, Inc., a Texas Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing) Filed by Decoking Descaling Technology, Inc., a Texas Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Decoking Descaling Technology, Inc., a Texas Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Decoking Descaling Technology, Inc., a Texas Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Order (Proposed Ex-Parte Order)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Christopher Forgues ISO DF's Opposition to OSC re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Ord...))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/27/2020)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Francisco Arrieta ISO DF's Opposition to OSC re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Christine McBain)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant, D.D. Technology Inc.'s Opposition to Preliminary Injunction and OSC; MPAs)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Roman Korpus ISO DF's Opposition to OSC re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections to the Dec of Gordon Grange ISO of OSC re Prelim Injunction)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections to the Dec of Angel Lopez ISO of OSC re Prelim Injunction)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/09/2020)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of William A. Sulentor)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Time Change of Hearings)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Reply (Defendant, D.D. Technology Inc.'s Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ("Timothy J. McCoy CSR# 4745")
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 28, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 15, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.