Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IN THE MATTER OF: AUDREY MARIE ALVAREZ
On September 04, 2020 a petition for change of name (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Alvarez Audrey Marie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Michael P. Vicencia presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 04, 2020
Last Refreshed
September 05, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Petition for Change of Name (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Name Change
Status
Other
Case Duration
3 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 12/07/2020 | ||
December 07, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) | ||
December 07, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change scheduled for in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Motion Granted Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Michael P. Vicencia |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 07, 2020 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 07, 2020 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 12/07/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 07, 2020 | hearing |
Decree Changing Name Filed by Clerk |
|
December 01, 2020 | Proof of Publication | ||
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication; Filed by: Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner); As to: Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner); Service Costs Waived: No |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
December 01, 2020 | hearing |
Proof of Publication Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael P. Vicencia |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Michael P. Vicencia |
|
October 20, 2020 | hearing |
Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802 Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change |
|
October 19, 2020 | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) | ||
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
October 19, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change scheduled for in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 19, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Los Angeles County Probation Department of Pretrial Services Bureau Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 16, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)] | ||
September 16, 2020 | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) | ||
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Status Date changed from to ; Status changed from TP to Filed | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); TP by: | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 16, 2020 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 16, 2020 | hearing |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 04, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
September 04, 2020 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
September 04, 2020 | Petition for Change of Name | ||
September 04, 2020 | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) | ||
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
September 04, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change scheduled for in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 04, 2020 | hearing |
Petition for Change of Name Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
September 04, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
September 04, 2020 | hearing |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Audrey Marie Alvarez (Petitioner) |
|
September 04, 2020 | hearing |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|