Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
504 ESPLANADE, INC. VS WILLIAM E DALLESKE
On December 31, 2020 a small claims (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by 504 Esplanade Inc., against Dalleske William E Aka William Ernest Dalleske, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Ronald F. Frank presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 31, 2020
Last Refreshed
September 18, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Inglewood
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
David K. Reinert;Category
Small Claims (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Default Judgment
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from William E Dalleske (Defendant) to William E Dalleske (Defendant) | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: 504 Esplanade, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: William E Dalleske (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment entered on ; Status Date changed from to ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment entered on ; Status Date changed from to | |
August 15, 2022 | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment | ||
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Inglewood Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. David K\. Reinert; Reason: Inventory Transfer | |
April 30, 2021 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Ronald F. Frank |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of , Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: 504 Esplanade, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff 504 Esplanade, Inc. against Defendant William E Dalleske AKA William Ernest Dalleske on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by 504 Esplanade, Inc. on for the principal amount of $4,590.58 and costs of $515.00 for a total of $5,105.58. |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk |
|
April 30, 2021 | hearing |
Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301 Non-Jury Trial Judge: Ronald F. Frank |
|
April 30, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | ||
April 30, 2021 | Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) | ||
April 30, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/30/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets | ||
April 30, 2021 | Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) | ||
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: 504 Esplanade, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: William E Dalleske (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 465.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
April 06, 2021 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: 504 Esplanade, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: William E Dalleske (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/30/2021; Service Cost: 465.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: 504 Esplanade, Inc. (Plaintiff); William E Dalleske (Defendant) | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]; Issued by: Clerk | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of remote appearance and exchange and submission of evidence protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: 504 Esplanade, Inc. (Plaintiff); William E Dalleske (Defendant) | |
March 11, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer] | ||
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of remote appearance and exchange and submission of evidence protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: 504 Esplanade, Inc. (Plaintiff); William E Dalleske (Defendant) | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: 504 Esplanade, Inc. (Plaintiff); William E Dalleske (Defendant) | |
January 04, 2021 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
Judge: Ronald F. Frank |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2021 in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
Judge: Ronald F. Frank |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: 504 Esplanade, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: William E Dalleske (Defendant) |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse | |
December 31, 2020 | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court | ||
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: 504 Esplanade, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: William E Dalleske (Defendant) |
|