Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Srs Distribution Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hettena Alexander V, against Horizon Upgrades Inc A California Corporation, Kazaryan Anait, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale with Ralph C. Hofer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseGlendale |
Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE
Date: July 28, 2020Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE
Date: July 06, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: August 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 28, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 24, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT BY DEFAULT
Date: October 12, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY
Date: October 13, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 13, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: October 23, 2020Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )
Date: January 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 10, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: January 08, 2021Writ - Return
Date: August 02, 2021Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 03, 2021Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE
Date: November 18, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 01, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 16, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 07, 2022Judgment
Date: February 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/DEFAULT PRO...)
Date: February 03, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 16, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY
Date: February 16, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: May 03, 2022Default Judgment
Date: May 03, 2022Judgment
Date: May 03, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 23, 2022Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )
Date: June 27, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: August 03, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE
Date: September 22, 2022Notice - NOTICE RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN ON REAL PROPERTY
Date: November 09, 2022Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. on , judgment entered on as to ANAIT KAZARYAN is
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-20
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. on , judgment entered on as to ANAIT KAZARYAN is
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. on , Default entered on , Vacated - Court order of .
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE; Filed by: SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. on , Default entered on , Vacated - Clerical correction.
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Updated -- On the Complaint filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. on , judgment entered on is vacated
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Motion to Vacate DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Declaration OF ATTORNEY; Filed by: SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Updated -- On the Complaint filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. on , judgment entered on is vacated
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE; Filed by: SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Declaration OF ATTORNEY; Filed by: SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence; Filed by: SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Default Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Affidavit (of Reasonable Diligence) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF ATTORNEY) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Complaint Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (DEFAULT JUDGMENT) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((LOS ANGELES )) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Judgment Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Vacate Default Judgment pursuant...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: June 11, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 11, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: June 11, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 11, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 11, 2020Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF ATTORNEY) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Affidavit (OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment/Default Pro...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Affidavit (OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles )) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice (RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN ON REAL PROPERTY) Filed by SRS DISTRIBUTION INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: November 09, 2022Stipulation and Order (TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE) Filed by ANAIT KAZARYAN (Defendant)
Date: September 22, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Affidavit (OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Affidavit (OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (OF ATTORNEY)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles ))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment/Default Pro...))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Affidavit (of Reasonable Diligence)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF ATTORNEY)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Vacate Default Judgment pursuant...))
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles ))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Affidavit (OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Vacate Default Judgment pursuant...))
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Affidavit (OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF ATTORNEY)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Affidavit (of Reasonable Diligence)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Judgment (BY COURT BY DEFAULT)
Date: 2020-10-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.