Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shelton, Cheri Michele, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shelton, David Dean, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJune 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 3rd Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default-Entered | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration re Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default-Not Entered | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default - Uncontested | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed Jurisdiction Date 04/19/2022 |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Family Law Status Conference (CRC 5.83) | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 2nd Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Family Law Status Conference (CRC 5.83) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.