Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Del Norte filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryStatement For Reg Of California Supp Order - Dcss |
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification DCSS Motion for Modification of Child Support & Health Care; 03/30/2021 Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Fee Waiver - Granted | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the Motion as to the Other Parent | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Modification (DCSS Only) Motion for Modification of Child Support & Health Care |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the Motion as to the Respondent | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service DCSS Proof of Service by Mail of Notice Regarding Payment of Support, Registration of California Support Order, Statement for Registration of California Support Order as to the Respondent |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice re Payment of Support | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Registration of California Support Order | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement for Registration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.