Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Railey, Leah, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Railey, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Clare Keithley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJune 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Petitioner's RFO to Refinance & Buy-out Other Party's Equity Interest in Family Residence - Filed 04/20/2021 Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed -Jurisdiction Date; 03/23/2021 |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default-Entered | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default - Uncontested | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) RFO to Refinance & Buy-out Other Party's Equity Interest in Family Residence |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of the RFO as to Respondent | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.